Which multiplication technique do you use for 3 and 4 digit numbers and why?

I’ve been practicing a lot with vedic mathematics lately and was interested in other techniques for quickly adding, subtracting, dividing or multiplying. I don’t really go over 4 digits in my day to day life. I’m new to mental math but use other memory systems to compete.

Please share!

I use (**urdhwatiryagbhyam method **) for 3 and 4 digit multiplication .

And when you memorize all 2 digit multiplication tables
From 00 * 99

You will be better in 3 and 4 digit faster calculation.
Even 5 and 6 digit calculation.

1 Like

Some questions are “nice” and can be solved with special tricks, e.g.

135 * 246 = 270 * 123 = 270|00 + 27 * 23 * 10 = 27000 + (25^2 - 2^2) * 10 = 27000 + 6210 = 33210

625 * 432 = 10000/16 * 27 * 16 = 270000

For questions that are spoken rather than written, it’s important to use as many of these shortcuts as possible.

For spoken questions, or ones where I don’t see any shortcuts, then I would use cross-multiplication, which is a more complete version of one of the 2-by-2 multiplication method from Vedic Mathematics.

1 Like